CA AB2498 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.3 (commencing with Section 6700) to Part 1 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Department of Transportation: Construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2498 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - WORF AB2498 Gordon (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2498 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - WORF AB2498 Gordon (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2498 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6787.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 6791.). | |
2012-08-31 | From inactive file. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5066.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5066.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5077.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the A | |
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |
2012-08-22 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-15 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-08-14 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6). | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-06-14 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-25 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-25 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4981.) | |
2012-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |
2012-05-02 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 23). | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 6700 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 6800 | New Code | See Bill Text |