CA AB2494 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 425, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 425, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 128.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts.
Title
Courts: frivolous actions or proceedings.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2494 COOLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2494 Cooley By Lieu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2494 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2494 Cooley By Lieu (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2494 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 425, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6478.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4818.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5277.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 128.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |