CA AB2489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 25001 of, and to repeal Section 25003 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 25001 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |