CA AB2478 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17151 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: gross income: exclusion: student loan assistance.
Sponsors
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] |
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23). |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |