CA AB2456 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1797.184 and 1797.200 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Emergency medical services: regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2456 TORRICO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2456 Torrico By Cedillo (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2456 TORRICO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2456 Torrico By Cedillo (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2456 TORRICO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 6739.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6707.) | |
2010-08-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-25 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4876.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14) | |
2010-08-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 6.) | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 30). | |
2010-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 5504.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 2.) (April 13). | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |