CA AB2455 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 505, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 505, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 61040 of, and to add and repeal Sections 61040.1 and 61040.2 of, the Government Code, relating to community services districts.
Title
The Santa Rita Hills Community Services District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2455 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2455 Williams By Jackson (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 2455 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2455 Williams By Jackson (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 2455 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 505, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 6. Page 6588.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4849.). |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2014-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 4711.) |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 23). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 61040 | New Code | See Bill Text |