CA AB2454 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 454.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: procurement plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2454 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2454 Williams By Hueso (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2454 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2454 Williams By Hueso (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2454 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6296.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5248.). |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 5193.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 27). |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 20). |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 454.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 921 | New Code | See Bill Text |