CA AB2453 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3225, 3236.5, 3743, and 3744 of, to add Section 3763 to, and to repeal and add Sections 3350, 3351, 3352, 3353, 3354, 3355, 3356, 3762, 3764, 3765, 3766, 3767, and 3768 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: operations: enforcement actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Van Tran [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2453 TRAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2453 Tran By Harman (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2453 TRAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2453 Tran By Harman (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2453 TRAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6477.) | |
2010-08-19 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4680.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5458.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-13 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |