CA AB245 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12894 of the Government Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: public meetings.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Asm. Tim Donnelly [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] | Asm. Brian Nestande [R] |
Asm. Donald Wagner [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2013-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12894 | Amended Code | Citation Text |