CA AB2447 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add, repeal, and add Article 3.3 (commencing with Section 3170) of Chapter 1 of Division 3 of the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas wastewater: unlined ponds: prohibition.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Quirk. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |