CA AB2445 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 52372.7 of the Education Code, relating to career technical education.
Title
Education: achievement gap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |