CA AB2442 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65915 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Density bonuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2442 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2442 Holden By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2442 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2442 Holden By Beall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2442 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 10. Page 6344.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5288.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 8. Page 4863.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 11). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |