CA AB2430 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Chesbro.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Chesbro.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19020 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to blind individuals.
Title
Department of Rehabilitation: blindness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Chesbro. | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5). | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |