CA AB2426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15408 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trustee: power to terminate trust.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2426 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - AB 2426 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4563.)
2018-04-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2018-03-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Probate Code15408Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback