CA AB2423 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to employment.
Title
Department of Industrial Relations: funds: employer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-23 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-03-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |