CA AB2417 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 44949.1 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
San Diego Unified School District: certificated school
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44949 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44949.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |