CA AB2411 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13218 of the Elections Code, relating to voting.
Title
Voting: ballot design.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |