CA AB2410 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39803.5 to the Education Code, relating to local educational agencies.
Title
Local educational agencies: home-to-school transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 39803.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |