CA AB2402 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Eggman.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Eggman.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15853 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: continuous eligibility.
Sponsors
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2402 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2402 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Eggman. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4935.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |