CA AB2399 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4141 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: state hospitals: injury and illness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2399 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2399 Allen By Wolk (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2399 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2399 Allen By Wolk (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2399 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 751, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m. | |
2012-08-28 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6426.). | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 4748.). | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-07-02 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-21 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4882.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-04-12 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 4332.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4332.) (Pending re-referral to Com. on L. & E.) | |
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. & E. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4141 | New Code | See Bill Text |