CA AB2397 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1522.08 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to administrative actions.
Title
Health and human services: information sharing: administrative actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent AB2397 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2397 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 2397 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5703.). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-07-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4899.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1522.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |