CA AB2396 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 480 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to expungement.
Title
Convictions: expungement: licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 2396 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2396 Bonta By Corbett (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2396 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2396 Bonta By Corbett (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2396 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 6445.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4711.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 5095.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4952.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 7). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 480 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |