CA AB2392 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27803 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: motorcycle: safety helmet exception.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 27803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |