CA AB2391 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 361.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Dependent children: placement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2391 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5191.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |