CA AB2373 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2105 and 2107 of the Family Code, relating to dissolution of marriage.
Title
Dissolution of marriage and legal separation: disclosure of assets and liabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2373 ACOSTA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4790.) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 2105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 2107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |