CA AB2369 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 6344 of the Family Code, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Domestic Violence Prevention Act: attorney’s fees and costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2369 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2369 Salas et al. By Rubio (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2369 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2369 Salas et al. By Rubio (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2369 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 591, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5180.). |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 21). |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4817.) |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6344 | New Code | See Bill Text |