CA AB2364 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - In committee: Referred to suspense file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - In committee: Referred to suspense file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1420, 1429, 1429.5, and 1430 of, and to add Section 1435 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Property service worker protection.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2364 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading By ORTEGA (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2364 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading By ORTEGA (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 10.) |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1429 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1429.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1435 | New Code | See Bill Text |