CA AB2362 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42285.5 of the Education Code, relating to education finance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Education finance: necessary small high schools: average
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2362 CONWAY Third Reading Urgency (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2362 CONWAY Third Reading Urgency (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-06 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2012-06-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5064.). | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-03 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-18 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42285.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |