CA AB2361 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 707 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: transfer to court of criminal jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2361 Mia Bonta et al. By Kamlager (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2361 Mia Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2361 Mia Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5011.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 4933.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 707 | Amended Code | Citation Text |