CA AB2358 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.74 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] |
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2358 GONZALEZ Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2358 Gonzalez By Hall Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2358 BIGELOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2358 Gonzalez By Hall Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2358 BIGELOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6115.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5021.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5107.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.74 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14838.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |