CA AB2343 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6025 of, and to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 6048) to Chapter 5 of Title 7 of Part 3 of, the Penal Code, relating to the Board of State and Community Corrections.
Title
Board of State and Community Corrections.
Sponsors
Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2343 Akilah Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2343 Akilah Weber et al. By Atkins (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2343 Akilah Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2343 Akilah Weber et al. By Atkins (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2343 Akilah Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 17.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 5213.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 6025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6048 | New Code | See Bill Text |