CA AB2332 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14526, 14526.4, and 14526.5 of, and to add Section 14031.9 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 167 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation funding: complete streets.
Sponsors
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Asm. Chris Holden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14031.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14526 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14526.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14528.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |