CA AB2328 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45302 and 88121 of the Education Code, relating to classified employees.
Title
Classified employees: school and community college districts: merit system: disciplinary action.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |