CA AB2325 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 3599.50) to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, and to add Article 4.6 (commencing with Section 14146) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: CommuniCal.
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2325 John A. P (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2325 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2325 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2325 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2325 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6667.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6672.). |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4933.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5298.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P.E.,R. & S.S. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3599.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14146 | New Code | See Bill Text |