CA AB2307 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12532 of, and to add Section 12215 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to weights and measures.
Title
Weights and measures: reporting fraud.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2307 Chau By Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2307 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2307 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4964.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4788.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 12215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 12532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |