CA AB2307 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45298 and 88117 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: reemployment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2307 BUTLER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2307 Butler By Vargas (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2307 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2307 Butler By Vargas (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2307 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 6112.). | |
2012-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4572.). | |
2012-07-05 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). | |
2012-06-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 4892.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 2). | |
2012-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-03-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45298 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |