CA AB2305 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7125 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 11665 of the Insurance Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contractors: workers' compensation insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2305 KNIGHT Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2305 Knight By Runner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2305 KNIGHT Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2305 Knight By Runner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2305 KNIGHT Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6463.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 6487.) | |
2010-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4705.) | |
2010-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21). | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and L. & I.R. | |
2010-05-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 5134.) | |
2010-05-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |
2010-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |