CA AB2302 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 400.4 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Hydrogen underground storage: study.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 30). |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 400.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |