CA AB2295 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 65914.7 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Local educational agencies: housing development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2295 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2295 Bloom et al. By Wiener (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2295 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2295 Bloom et al. By Wiener (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2295 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 652, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 17.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 5209.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 21). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-06-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING and E.Q. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 19.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11). |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 27). |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20). |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65914.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |