CA AB2293 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 12812.7 and 12812.8 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 25244.17.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Green Business Program and Green Assistance
Sponsors
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12812.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12812.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25244.17.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39717 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44480 | New Code | See Bill Text |