CA AB2293 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 389, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 5430) to Chapter 8 of Division 2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation network companies: insurance coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 2293 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB2293 Bonilla By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2293 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Insurance (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 389, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2014-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6667.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6669.).
2014-08-27SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4919.).
2014-08-26SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4881.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-22SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14).
2014-08-04SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 25).
2014-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
2014-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and INS.
2014-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5157.)
2014-05-15AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4950.)
2014-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 7).
2014-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2014-04-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
2014-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2014-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2014-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2014-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2014-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2014-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2014-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code11580.24Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5430New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2293&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140328_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140410_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140515_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140619_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140702_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140820_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140822_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140826_amended_sen_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_bill_20140917_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140428_000004_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140507_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140527_1220PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140617_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140625_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140804_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140814_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140827_0554PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2293_vote_20140828_0601PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback