CA AB2285 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1004 to the Public Resources Code, relating to natural resources.
Title
Natural resources: equitable outdoor access: 30x30 goal: urban nature-based projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2285 Rendon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2285 Rendon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2024-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and W., P., & W. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 1004 | New Code | See Bill Text |