CA AB2285 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39719.2 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4853 and 21809 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2285 TRANS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2285 TRANS (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2285 TRANS. Assembly Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2285 TRANS (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2285 TRANS. Assembly Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5315.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4384.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4825.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21809 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |