CA AB2282 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 432.3 and 1197.5 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Salary history information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2282 Eggman By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2282 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5106.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5214.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1197.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code432.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback