CA AB2282 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 606, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 606, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17921.5 and 18940.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards.
Title
Building standards: recycled water systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2282 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2282 Gatto By DeSaulnier (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2282 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2282 Gatto By DeSaulnier (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2282 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 606, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6362.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4715.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5187.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 17921.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18940.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |