CA AB2278 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1947.12 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancies.
Title
Rent increases: percentage change in the cost of living: Department of Housing and Community Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Assembly - AB 2278 Wendy Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1947.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |