CA AB2269 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 450 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Board membership qualifications: public members.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2269 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4997.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |