CA AB2269 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 1834.7 of the Civil Code, relating to animal shelters.
Title
Animal shelters: research animals: prohibitions.
Sponsors
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] |
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2269 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2269 Waldron By Monning (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2269 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2269 Waldron By Monning (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2269 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6113.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5025.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4498.) |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4455.) |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13). |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1834.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |