CA AB2250 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.37 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10123.52 to the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14132.14 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health.
Title
Social determinants of health: screening and outreach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |