CA AB2250 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14106 to the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Toll facilities: revenues.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AB 2250 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2250 Daly By DeSaulnier (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2250 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2250 Daly By DeSaulnier (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2250 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6289.). |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4647.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4970.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14106 | New Code | See Bill Text |